WV SB334 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 215, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 215, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing license application process for harm reduction programs
Title
Establishing license application process for needle exchange programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 638) (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Motion to suspend rules to permit amendment in third degree rejected (Roll No. 637) (Y: 31 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 443) (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 440) (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 546) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 545) (Y: 36 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 98) (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Motion to suspend rules to permit amendment in third degree rejected (Roll No. 637) (Y: 31 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 443) (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 440) (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 546) (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 545) (Y: 36 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 98) (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 215, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/15/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/15/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/15/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/15/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/15/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-15 | Senate | To Governor 4/15/21 |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-10 | House | Effective ninety days from passage |
2021-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 638) |
2021-04-10 | House | Previous question adopted |
2021-04-10 | House | Motion to suspend rules to permit amendment in third degree rejected (Roll No. 637) |
2021-04-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 443) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate reconsidered action (voice vote) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 440) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-09 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 546) |
2021-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-09 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2021-04-09 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 545) |
2021-04-09 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2021-04-09 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2021-04-09 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Amendment pending |
2021-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-04-07 | House | Immediate consideration |
2021-04-07 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2021-04-02 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-04-02 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2021-03-10 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2021-03-10 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 98) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Lindsay Floor amendments rejected (Voice vote) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Stollings Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Tarr Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-02-18 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-18 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 63 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 63 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 63 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 63 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 63 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 63 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 63 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 63 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 63 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 63 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |