WV SB273 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB273


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Reducing use of opiates

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Reducing use of certain prescription drugs


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 457) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 399) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 392) (Y: 37 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 391) (Y: 36 N: 59 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 137) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Baldwin Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 133) (Y: 11 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Stollings Amendment as amended adopted (Roll No. 132) (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]


2018-03-10HouseHouse received Senate message
2018-03-09SenateCompleted legislative action
2018-03-09SenateCommunicated to House
2018-03-09SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 457)
2018-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-08HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 399)
2018-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-07HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 392)
2018-03-07HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 391)
2018-03-07HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-07HousePlaced at foot of bills on 2nd reading
2018-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-07HousePlaced on Special Calender
2018-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2018-03-06HousePlaced on House Calender
2018-03-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-05HouseRead 1st time
2018-03-05HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-03HouseWith amendment, do pass
2018-03-02HouseTo House Judiciary
2018-03-02HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2018-02-19HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2018-02-19HouseTo Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-16SenateOrdered to House
2018-02-16SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 137)
2018-02-16SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-16SenateAmended on 3rd reading (Voice vote)
2018-02-16SenateUnanimous consent to amend
2018-02-16SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-02-15SenateFerns Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-02-15SenateBaldwin Floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 133)
2018-02-15SenateStollings Amendment as amended adopted (Roll No. 132)
2018-02-15SenateTakubo Amendment to Stollings amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-02-15SenateStollings Floor amendment reported
2018-02-15SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-14SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 2/14/18
2018-02-14SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-02-13SenateRead 1st time
2018-02-13SenateOn 1st reading
2018-02-12SenateCommittee substitute for committee substitute reported
2018-02-02SenateTo Judiciary
2018-02-02SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
2018-01-15SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2018-01-15SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-01-15SenateTo Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
2018-01-15SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB4263 (Similar To) 2018-01-23 - To House Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse
SB273 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - To Finance
HB4336 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - To Governor 3/15/18 - House Journal
HB4465 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Senate requests House to concur
HB4481 (Similar To) 2018-02-27 - To Health and Human Resources
HB4304 (Similar To) 2018-02-21 - To Health and Human Resources


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16541New CodeSee Bill Text
16542New CodeSee Bill Text
16543New CodeSee Bill Text
16544New CodeSee Bill Text
16545New CodeSee Bill Text
16546New CodeSee Bill Text
16547New CodeSee Bill Text
16548New CodeSee Bill Text
16549New CodeSee Bill Text
165H2Amended CodeCitation Text
165H9Amended CodeCitation Text
165Y2Amended CodeCitation Text
165Y4Amended CodeCitation Text
165Y5Amended CodeCitation Text
301019Amended CodeCitation Text
301412aAmended CodeCitation Text
30314Amended CodeCitation Text
30362Amended CodeCitation Text
303A1Amended CodeCitation Text
303A2Amended CodeCitation Text
303A3Amended CodeCitation Text
303A4Amended CodeCitation Text
30419Amended CodeCitation Text
3056Amended CodeCitation Text
30711Amended CodeCitation Text
30818Amended CodeCitation Text
60A2204Amended CodeCitation Text
60A2206Amended CodeCitation Text
60A2210Amended CodeCitation Text
60A5509New CodeSee Bill Text
60A94Amended CodeCitation Text
60A95Amended CodeCitation Text
60A95aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/senate/02-15-0132.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/senate/02-15-0133.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/senate/02-16-0137.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00391.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00392.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00399.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/senate/03-09-0457.pdf

Bill Comments