WV HB4304 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to combine the board of Examiners for Licensed Practical Nurses and West Virginia Board of Examiners for Registered Professional Nurses into a new Board of Nurses. ยง30-7-1 et seq. has been rewritten; therefore it has been completely underscored.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the Board of Nursing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 164) (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2018-02-21SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2018-02-21SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-02-21SenateHouse Message received
2018-02-20HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-02-20HousePassed House (Roll No. 164)
2018-02-20HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-20HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-19HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-02-19HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-19HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-16HouseRead 1st time
2018-02-16HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-15HouseBy substitute, do pass
2018-02-02HouseTo House Government Organization
2018-02-02HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization
2018-01-25HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2018-01-25HouseIntroduced in House
2018-01-25HouseTo Health and Human Resources then Government Organization
2018-01-25HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16303Amended CodeCitation Text
164C14Amended CodeCitation Text
164F1Amended CodeCitation Text
165B19Repealed CodeCitation Text
165O12Amended CodeCitation Text
165O2Amended CodeCitation Text
165O4Amended CodeCitation Text
165O5Amended CodeCitation Text
165Y5Amended CodeCitation Text
18522Amended CodeCitation Text
189A2Amended CodeCitation Text
18A11Amended CodeCitation Text
18A41Amended CodeCitation Text
18A48Amended CodeCitation Text
18C34Amended CodeCitation Text
2912B3Amended CodeCitation Text
29293Amended CodeCitation Text
30120Amended CodeCitation Text
3017aAmended CodeCitation Text
30242Amended CodeCitation Text
30243Amended CodeCitation Text
303A1Amended CodeCitation Text
303F1Amended CodeCitation Text
3071Amended CodeCitation Text
30710Amended CodeCitation Text
30711Amended CodeCitation Text
30711aRepealed CodeCitation Text
30712Amended CodeCitation Text
30713Amended CodeCitation Text
30714Amended CodeCitation Text
30715Amended CodeCitation Text
30715aRepealed CodeCitation Text
30715bRepealed CodeCitation Text
30715cRepealed CodeCitation Text
30715dRepealed CodeCitation Text
30715eRepealed CodeCitation Text
30716Amended CodeCitation Text
30717Amended CodeCitation Text
30718Amended CodeCitation Text
30719Amended CodeCitation Text
3071aRepealed CodeCitation Text
3072Amended CodeCitation Text
30720Amended CodeCitation Text
30721New CodeSee Bill Text
30722New CodeSee Bill Text
30723New CodeSee Bill Text
30724New CodeSee Bill Text
30725New CodeSee Bill Text
30726New CodeSee Bill Text
30727New CodeSee Bill Text
30728New CodeSee Bill Text
30729New CodeSee Bill Text
3073Amended CodeCitation Text
30730New CodeSee Bill Text
30731New CodeSee Bill Text
30732New CodeSee Bill Text
30733New CodeSee Bill Text
3074Amended CodeCitation Text
3075Amended CodeCitation Text
3076Amended CodeCitation Text
3076aRepealed CodeCitation Text
3076bRepealed CodeCitation Text
3077Amended CodeCitation Text
3078Amended CodeCitation Text
3078aRepealed CodeCitation Text
3079Amended CodeCitation Text
307A1Amended CodeCitation Text
307A10Repealed CodeCitation Text
307A11Repealed CodeCitation Text
307A2Repealed CodeCitation Text
307A3Repealed CodeCitation Text
307A4Repealed CodeCitation Text
307A5Repealed CodeCitation Text
307A6Repealed CodeCitation Text
307A6aRepealed CodeCitation Text
307A7Repealed CodeCitation Text
307A7aRepealed CodeCitation Text
307A8Repealed CodeCitation Text
307A9Repealed CodeCitation Text
307B4Amended CodeCitation Text
307C1Amended CodeCitation Text
307C7Amended CodeCitation Text
307D1Repealed CodeCitation Text
307D10Repealed CodeCitation Text
307D11Repealed CodeCitation Text
307D12Repealed CodeCitation Text
307D13Repealed CodeCitation Text
307D2Repealed CodeCitation Text
307D3Repealed CodeCitation Text
307D4Repealed CodeCitation Text
307D5Repealed CodeCitation Text
307D6Repealed CodeCitation Text
307D7Repealed CodeCitation Text
307D8Repealed CodeCitation Text
307D9Repealed CodeCitation Text
307E1Repealed CodeCitation Text
307E2Repealed CodeCitation Text
307E3Repealed CodeCitation Text
41010Amended CodeCitation Text
94B1Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback