WV HB4465 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to authorize the West Virginia Acupuncture Board to issue certificates for performing auricular acudetox therapy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the acupuncture board to issue certificates to perform auricular acudetox therapy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 510) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 217) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateSenate requests House to concur
2018-03-10SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 510)
2018-03-10SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-10SenateAmended on 3rd reading (Voice vote)
2018-03-10SenateUnanimous consent to amend
2018-03-09SenateLaid over on 3rd reading 3/9/18
2018-03-09SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-03-07SenateRead 1st time
2018-03-07SenateImmediate consideration
2018-03-07SenateReported do pass
2018-02-27SenateTo Government Organization
2018-02-27SenateTo Government Organization
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-02-27SenateHouse Message received
2018-02-26HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-02-26HousePassed House (Roll No. 217)
2018-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-26HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-23HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-23HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-22HouseRead 1st time
2018-02-22HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-21HouseDo pass
2018-02-14HouseTo House Government Organization
2018-02-14HouseDo pass, but first to Government Organization
2018-02-07HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2018-02-07HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-07HouseTo Health and Human Resources then Government Organization
2018-02-07HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
303610Amended CodeCitation Text
303614Amended CodeCitation Text
303617Amended CodeCitation Text
303618Amended CodeCitation Text
30362Amended CodeCitation Text
30367Amended CodeCitation Text
30369Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback