WV HB4481 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]


The purpose of this bill is to require licensees or registrants of the boards of medicine, osteopathic medicine, registered professional nursing, and practical nursing to report the professional incompetence or inability to practice of any licensee or registrant of his or her own board or of the other three listed boards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to mandatory inter-board reporting by licensees or registrants of the boards of medicine, osteopathic medicine, nursing


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 218) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-02-27SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2018-02-27SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-02-27SenateHouse Message received
2018-02-26HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-02-26HousePassed House (Roll No. 218)
2018-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-26HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-23HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-23HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-22HouseRead 1st time
2018-02-22HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-21HouseBy substitute, do pass
2018-02-14HouseTo House Government Organization
2018-02-14HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization
2018-02-09HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2018-02-09HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-09HouseTo Health and Human Resources then Government Organization
2018-02-09HouseFiled for introduction


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3015Amended CodeCitation Text
301411Amended CodeCitation Text
30314Amended CodeCitation Text
30711Amended CodeCitation Text
307A10Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

Bill Comments