WV HB4336 | 2018 | Regular Session


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - To Governor 3/15/18 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


The purpose of this bill is to update the schedule of controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Updating the schedule of controlled substances


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 490) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 405) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 245) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-03-15HouseTo Governor 3/15/18 - House Journal
2018-03-15HouseTo Governor 3/15/18
2018-03-10SenateTo Governor 3/15/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-10SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-09HouseCompleted legislative action
2018-03-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-09HousePassed House (Roll No. 490)
2018-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate title amendment
2018-03-09HouseHouse received Senate message
2018-03-08SenateSenate requests House to concur
2018-03-08SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 405)
2018-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-07SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-03-06SenateRead 1st time
2018-03-06SenateOn 1st reading
2018-03-05SenateReported do pass, with title amendment
2018-03-01SenateTo Judiciary
2018-03-01SenateTo Judiciary
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-03-01SenateHouse Message received
2018-02-28HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-02-28HousePassed House (Roll No. 245)
2018-02-28HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-28HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-27HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-26HouseRead 1st time
2018-02-26HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-23HouseBy substitute, do pass
2018-02-02HouseTo House Judiciary
2018-02-02HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2018-01-26HouseTo House Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse
2018-01-26HouseIntroduced in House
2018-01-26HouseTo Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse then Judiciary
2018-01-26HouseFiled for introduction


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60A2204Amended CodeCitation Text
60A2206Amended CodeCitation Text
60A2210Amended CodeCitation Text
60A2212Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

Bill Comments