WV SB257 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-05 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-05 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to codify existing common law in West Virginia as it relates to the duty of care possessors of property owe trespassers.
Title
Relating to real property possessor's liability for harm to trespassers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-05 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-05 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-01-31 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |