WV SB12 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 213, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 213, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to local health department accountability
Title
Relating to local health department accountability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 71) (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 57) (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 25) (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 57) (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 25) (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 213, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/16/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/16/21 |
2021-03-17 | House | Approved by Governor 3/16/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/10/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/21 |
2021-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 71) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-02-26 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 57) |
2021-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-02-24 | House | Reference dispensed |
2021-02-24 | House | Immediate consideration |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 25) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Karnes Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Maroney Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/22/21 with right to amend |
2021-02-22 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-10 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 2 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 2 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |