WV SB12 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Vetoed by Governor 3/25/14 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Vetoed by Governor 3/25/14 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to expedited partner therapy treatment
Title
Relating to expedited partner therapy treatment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 75) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 436) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 436) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/25/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/25/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/25/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/21/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-21 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/14 |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 75) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 436) |
2014-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-08 | House | Placed on Daily Calender |
2014-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on House Calender |
2014-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | Laid over on 3rd reading, Daily Calendar, until 3/5 |
2014-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-03 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-28 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-27 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2014-01-29 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-01-29 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 1/27/14 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-01-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-01-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-01-17 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 4F | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 4F | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 4F | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 4F | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 4F | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 14 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 14A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 3 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 3 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 15a | Amended Code | Citation Text |