WV HB5344 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-29 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-29 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
clarifying when a mentally incapacitated victim may not be required to testify in open court; and providing judicial discretion to determine the appropriateness of a mentally capacitated victim to testify.
Title
Relating to testimony of cognitively delayed persons in open court and criminal penalties for assault of cognitively delayed persons
Sponsors
Del. Scot Heckert [R] | Del. Roland Jennings [R] | Del. Charles Sheedy [R] | Del. Trenton Barnhart [R] |
Del. Mike Devault [R] | Del. Kathie Crouse [R] | Del. Vernon Criss [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 378) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-29 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 378) |
2024-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-30 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-30 | House | To Judiciary |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 8B | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |