WV HB5175 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 201, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Chapter 201, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to do away with the Center for Nursing and transfer its duties and authorities to the Higher Education Policy Commission.
Title
Eliminate funding for the Center for Nursing and transfer its duties and authorities to the Higher Education Policy Commission.
Sponsors
Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Heather Tully [R] | Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Joseph Statler [R] |
Del. Christopher Toney [R] | Del. Michael Hornby [R] | Del. Patrick Lucas [R] | Del. Todd Longanacre [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 325) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 236) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 236) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Chapter 201, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-01 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 325) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-02-21 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-21 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 236) |
2024-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-20 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-02-07 | House | To House Education |
2024-02-07 | House | Do pass, but first to Education |
2024-01-25 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2024-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-25 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Education |
2024-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB563 (Similar To) 2024-02-02 - To Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | 16 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18C | 3 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7A | 7a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7B | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7B | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7B | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7B | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7B | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7B | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7B | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |