WV HB4540 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 256, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 256, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To update all retirement plans to comport with federal law
Title
To update all retirement plans to comport with federal law
Sponsors
Del. Erikka Storch [R] | Del. Edward Evans [D] | Del. Mick Bates [D] | Del. William Anderson [R] |
Del. David Pethtel [D] | Del. Marty Gearheart [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 414) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 265) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 265) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 256, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/25/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 414) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2022-03-01 | Senate | To Pensions |
2022-03-01 | Senate | To Pensions then Finance |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 265) |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-02-15 | House | To House Finance |
2022-02-15 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2022-02-03 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-03 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2022-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 25B | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 2 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 2 | 54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 2A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 2A | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 2A | 6b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5V | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5V | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 5V | 8a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 7A | 14c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 7A | 28b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 7A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 7B | 12a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 7B | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18 | 7B | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 18 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 18 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 18 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 10 | 27b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 10 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 9 | 12b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 9 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 9 | 1a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 14D | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 14D | 7a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 14D | 9b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22A | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22A | 8a | Amended Code | Citation Text |