WV HB2776 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 315, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 315, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to update the meaning of federal adjusted gross income and certain other terms used in the West Virginia Personal Income Tax Act; and specify effective dates.
Title
Updating meaning of federal adjusted gross income and certain other terms used in West Virginia Personal Income Tax Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-03 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 130) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 130) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 37) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 36) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 130) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 37) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 36) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 315, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-02-14 | House | Approved by Governor 2/14/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Approved by Governor 2/14/2023 - House Journal |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/14/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-02-08 | House | To Governor 2/8/2023 |
2023-02-09 | House | To Governor 2/8/2023 - House Journal |
2023-02-08 | Senate | To Governor 2/8/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-02-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 130) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 130) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-01-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2023-01-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-01-25 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 37) |
2023-01-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 36) |
2023-01-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-01-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-01-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-01-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-01-20 | House | Do pass |
2023-01-18 | House | To House Finance |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-18 | House | To Finance |
2023-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB427 (Similar To) 2023-01-23 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |