WV HB2634 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The bill provides that an insurance provider who offers an insurance product in this state, the Bureau for Medical Services, and the Public Employees Insurance Agency must provide coverage for 20 visits per event for each of the treatment modalities of physical therapy, occupational therapy, osteopathic manipulation, a chronic pain management program, and chiropractic services when ordered or prescribed by a health care practitioner.
Title
Coverage for the treatment of chronic pain
Sponsors
Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Jeffrey Pack [R] | Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Ken Reed [R] |
Del. Todd Longanacre [R] | Del. Guy Ward [R] | Del. Don Forsht [R] | Del. Doug Smith [R] |
Del. Mick Bates [D] | Del. Brandon Steele [R] | Del. Paul Espinosa [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | To House Finance |
2021-03-16 | House | Committed to Finance on 2nd reading |
2021-03-16 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-15 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-15 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-12 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-02-25 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-25 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-22 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-22 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Health and Human Resources |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 54 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |