WV HB2542 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 174, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 174, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to correct an inconsistency in the code relating to the deposit of funds from the State Register and to ensure the use of electronic versions of the Register, rule monitor and index.
Title
Relating to publication of the State Register
Sponsors
Del. Jim Morgan [D] | Del. Dale Stephens [D] | Del. Ronnie Jones [D] | Del. Brady Paxton [D] |
Del. Margaret Smith [D] | Del. Margaret Staggers [D] | Del. William Hartman [D] | Del. Dana Lynch [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 293) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 292) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 6) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 6) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 157) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 156) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 292) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 6) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 6) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 157) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 156) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Chapter 174, Acts, 2013 |
2013-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/25/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-25 | House | To Governor 4/25/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/25/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 293) |
2013-04-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 292) |
2013-04-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 6) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 6) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-09 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance |
2013-04-04 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2013-04-04 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 157) |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 156) |
2013-04-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-03-29 | House | Do pass |
2013-03-01 | House | To House Finance |
2013-03-01 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2013-02-19 | House | To House Government Organization |
2013-02-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-02-19 | House | To Government Organization then Finance |
2013-02-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29A | 2 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |