WV HB2538 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-08 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-08 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove the requirement that a physician assistant have a certain current certification.
Title
Relating to the licensure of physician assistants
Sponsors
Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Amy Summers [R] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Linda Longstreth [D] |
Del. Ralph Rodighiero [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-08 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-15 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2017-03-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-13 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/14/17 |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2017-03-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-10 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-09 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-02-24 | House | To House Government Organization |
2017-02-24 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2017-02-17 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2017-02-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-17 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization |
2017-02-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 3E | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 3E | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 3E | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |