WV HB2239 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 2219
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 2219
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Board of Barbers and Cosmetologists to promulgate a legislative rule relating to Qualifications, Training, Examination and Certification of Instructors in Barbering and Cosmetology.
Title
Barbers and Cosmetologists, W.Va. Board of Qualifications, Training, Examination and Certification of Instructors in Barbering and Cosmetology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 2219 |
2017-02-17 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-02-17 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | House | To House Government Organization |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-09 | House | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB95 (Similar To) 2017-02-08 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 9 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |