WI AJR83 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming the third week of June as Pollinator Week.
Title
Proclaiming the third week of June as Pollinator Week.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Penny Schaber [D] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Rep. Garey Bies [R] |
Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. John Murtha [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] |
Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Rep. Katrina Shankland [D] | Rep. Patricia Strachota [R] |
Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Sen. Sheila Harsdorf [R] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] |
Sen. Mark Miller [D] | Sen. Fred Risser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-01-30 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr83 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AJR83.pdf |