WA SB5254 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective date 10/19/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Effective date 10/19/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring adequacy of buildable lands and zoning in urban growth areas and providing funding for low-income housing and homelessness programs.
Title
Ensuring adequacy of buildable lands and zoning in urban growth areas and providing funding for low-income housing and homelessness programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Guy Palumbo [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] |
Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | Senate | Effective date 10/19/2017. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Chapter 16, 2017 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-29 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-06-29 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |