WA SB5209 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Behavioral Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Behavioral Health Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing and expanding behavioral health and suicide prevention crisis response services.
Title
Enhancing and expanding behavioral health and suicide prevention crisis response services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1182 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 52 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
71 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
71 | 24 | 025 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
71 | 24 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
71 | 24 | 385 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
82 | New Code | See Bill Text |