WA HB1182 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enhancing and expanding behavioral health and suicide prevention crisis response services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhancing and expanding behavioral health and suicide prevention crisis response services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-03HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-28HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Same As/Similar To

SB5209 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-29 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3852New CodeSee Bill Text
4306New CodeSee Bill Text
4843New CodeSee Bill Text
7124New CodeSee Bill Text
7124025Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
7124045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7124385Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
82New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback