WA SB5107 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Effective date 7/24/2015*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Effective date 7/24/2015*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging the establishment of therapeutic courts.
Title
Encouraging the establishment of therapeutic courts.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] |
Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Donald Benton [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | Effective date 7/24/2015*. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Chapter 291, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2015-04-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2015-04-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-04-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-04-07 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-04-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2015-04-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-03-19 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-05 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1305 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.