WA HB1305 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging the establishment of therapeutic courts.
Title
Encouraging the establishment of therapeutic courts.
Sponsors
Rep. Brady Walkinshaw [D] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] |
Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB5107 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-18 - Effective date 7/24/2015*.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1305&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1305.pdf |