WA HB2317 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning animal welfare.
Title
Concerning animal welfare.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] |
Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-30 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6300 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.