WA SB6300 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning animal welfare.
Title
Concerning animal welfare.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 158, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | PS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-17 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2317 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-03 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.