LA SB373 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to individual income tax checkoff for donations to the Coastal Protection and Restoration Fund. (gov sig) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to individual income tax checkoff for donations to the Coastal Protection and Restoration Fund. (gov sig) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 373 FINAL PASSAGE (#34) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2024-03-19 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |