WA HB1970 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government and Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government and Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the waiver of certain requirements for public works projects costing less than five thousand dollars.
Title
Allowing the waiver of certain requirements for public works projects costing less than five thousand dollars.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-15 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1970&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1970.pdf |