WA HB1967 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting expansions of urban growth areas into one hundred year floodplains.
Title
Prohibiting expansions of urban growth areas into one hundred year floodplains.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-05 | Chapter 342, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-05 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-23 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-22 | President signed. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Passed final passage; yeas, 60; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-20 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2009-04-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 7; absent, 1; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-10 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-04-07 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-31 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-03-30 | GO - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-12 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2009-03-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-10 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-06 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-18 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-18 | LGH - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-18 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-18 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-16 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-04 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. |