WA HB1808 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing support for foster youth in obtaining drivers' licenses and automobile liability insurance.
Title
Providing support for foster youth in obtaining drivers' licenses and automobile liability insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-05 | House | Chapter 206, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-05 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | And refer to Transportation. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2017-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-02 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-03-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-21 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB5663 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Human Services & Corrections.