WA SB5663 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Human Services & Corrections.
Pending: Senate Human Services & Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Human Services & Corrections.
Pending: Senate Human Services & Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing support for foster youth in obtaining drivers' licenses and automobile liability insurance.
Title
Providing support for foster youth in obtaining drivers' licenses and automobile liability insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Andrew Billig [D] |
Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1808 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5663&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5663.pdf |