WA HB1547 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning entities that provide recreational or educational programming for school-aged children.
Title
Concerning entities that provide recreational or educational programming for school-aged children.
Sponsors
Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Roger Freeman [D] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] |
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Rep. Mary Roberts [D] |
Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Effective date 7/28/2013. |
2013-05-03 | House | Chapter 130, 2013 Laws. |
2013-05-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2013-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | And refer to Human Services & Corrections. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | EDU - Majority; without recommendation. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2013-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-19 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-19 | House | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services. |