WA HB1189 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to Transportation.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to Transportation.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning ferry system performance measures.
Title
Concerning ferry system performance measures.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Michelle Caldier [R] |
Rep. Lillian Ortiz-Self [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-21 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |