WA HB1024 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government and Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government and Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating Aplets and Cotlets as the state candy.
Title
Designating Aplets and Cotlets as the state candy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-01-22 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-20 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-01-20 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-20 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-01-20 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2009-12-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1024&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1024.pdf |