VT S0242 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the service of civil process by a constable
Title
An act relating to the service of civil process by a constable
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2016-04-13 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations |
2016-04-14 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2016-04-13 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Committee on Judiciary relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Sears |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |