VT H0553 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 19, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 19, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to eligibility of domestic partners for reimbursement from the Victims Compensation Program
Title
An act relating to eligibility of domestic partners for reimbursement from the Victims Compensation Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 19, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor on May 19, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-03 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-03 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-02 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-02 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-04-29 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-04-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-25 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-24 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-03-24 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-03-23 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary as amended agreed to |
2022-03-23 | House | Rep. Rachelson of Burlington moved to amend the bill which was agreed to |
2022-03-23 | House | Rep. Townsend of South Burlington recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-23 | House | Rep. Rachelson of Burlington reported for the Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-23 | House | Read Second time |
2022-03-23 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-22 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2022-01-12 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-01-11 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary |