VA SB7 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0334)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0334)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hate crimes and discrimination; ethnic animosity; penalties. Provides that it is the policy of the Commonwealth to safeguard all individuals within the Commonwealth from unlawful discrimination in employment and in places of public accommodation because of such individual's ethnic origin and prohibits such discrimination. The bill also adds victims who are intentionally selected because of their ethnic origin to the categories of victims whose intentional selection for a hate crime involving assault, assault and battery, or trespass for the purpose of damaging another's property results in a higher criminal penalty for the offense. The bill also provides that no provider or user of an interactive computer service on the Internet shall be liable for any action voluntarily taken by it in good faith to restrict access to material that the provider or user considers to be intended to incite hatred on the basis of ethnic origin.
Title
Hate crimes and discrimination; ethnic animosity, nondiscrimination in employment, etc., penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0334) | |
2024-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 334 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB7ER) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB7S1 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106213D-S1 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Incorporates SB120 (Subramanyam) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106213D-S1 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Moved from Judiciary to Courts of Justice due to a change of the committee name |
2023-11-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-11-20 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100086D |
Same As/Similar To
HB18 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0266)
SB120 (Similar To) 2024-01-24 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
SB120 (Similar To) 2024-01-24 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 57 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 49.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |