VA SB120 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-24 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-24 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Hate crimes and discrimination; ethnic animosity; penalties. Provides that it is the policy of the Commonwealth to safeguard all individuals within the Commonwealth from unlawful discrimination in employment and in places of public accommodation because of such individual's ethnic origin. The bill also adds victims who are intentionally selected because of their ethnic origin to the categories of victims whose intentional selection for a hate crime involving assault, assault and battery, or trespass for the purpose of damaging another's property results in a higher criminal penalty for the offense. The bill also provides that no provider or user of an interactive computer service on the Internet shall be liable for any action voluntarily taken by it in good faith to restrict access to material that the provider or user considers to be intended to incite hatred on the basis of ethnic origin.
Title
Hate crimes and discrimination; ethnic animosity, penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Incorporated by Courts of Justice |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Moved from Judiciary to Courts of Justice due to a change of the committee name |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103033D |
Same As/Similar To
HB18 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0266)
SB7 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0334)
SB7 (Similar To) 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0334)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 57 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 49.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |