VA SB1384 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1384
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; local arbitration agreements. Allows a participating locality, for any procurement solicitation or contract exceeding $10,000 for goods and services, to require the bidder or offeror to disclose certain information regarding pre-dispute arbitration clauses, defined in the bill, in employment, civil rights, and consumer disputes, and provides that a locality may consider the policies and practices related to arbitration of each bidder and offeror. The bill also provides that a participating locality shall require the bidder or offeror to provide written or electronic submissions to allow the locality to ascertain (i) whether the bidder or offeror requires persons with whom it is in a work relationship or prospective work relationship to sign or otherwise enter into a contract containing a pre-dispute arbitration clause that would cover an employment or civil rights dispute and (ii) whether the bidder or offeror requires consumers to sign or otherwise enter into a contract containing a pre-dispute arbitration clause that would cover a consumer or civil rights dispute as a condition of purchasing products or services, downloading mobile applications, or using websites. The bill authorizes a participating locality to cancel, terminate, or suspend, in whole or in part, the contract of any contractor that has violated a provision of the bill and to declare the contractor ineligible for further contracts with such locality for up to five years.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; local arbitration agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 17-N 1-A) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Surovell reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Surovell reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 17-N 1-A) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1384S3 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Surovell agreed to 21104413D-S3 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Surovell withdrawn 21104267D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Surovell reconsidered 21104267D-S1 (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21104413D-S3 (Surovell) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Surovell withdrawn |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Surovell withdrawn 21104309D-S2 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21104309D-S2 (Surovell) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Surovell reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Surovell agreed to |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Surovell agreed to 21104267D-S1 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Amendment #1 by Senator Surovell withdrawn |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21104267D-S1 (Surovell) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102806D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1384 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4377.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4377.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |