VA SB1384 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1384

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Public Procurement Act; local arbitration agreements. Allows a participating locality, for any procurement solicitation or contract exceeding $10,000 for goods and services, to require the bidder or offeror to disclose certain information regarding pre-dispute arbitration clauses, defined in the bill, in employment, civil rights, and consumer disputes, and provides that a locality may consider the policies and practices related to arbitration of each bidder and offeror. The bill also provides that a participating locality shall require the bidder or offeror to provide written or electronic submissions to allow the locality to ascertain (i) whether the bidder or offeror requires persons with whom it is in a work relationship or prospective work relationship to sign or otherwise enter into a contract containing a pre-dispute arbitration clause that would cover an employment or civil rights dispute and (ii) whether the bidder or offeror requires consumers to sign or otherwise enter into a contract containing a pre-dispute arbitration clause that would cover a consumer or civil rights dispute as a condition of purchasing products or services, downloading mobile applications, or using websites. The bill authorizes a participating locality to cancel, terminate, or suspend, in whole or in part, the contract of any contractor that has violated a provision of the bill and to declare the contractor ineligible for further contracts with such locality for up to five years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Public Procurement Act; local arbitration agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 17-N 1-A) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Surovell reconsidered 21104267D-S1 (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Surovell reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2021-02-19HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N)
2021-02-18HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2021-02-16HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-02-16HouseReported from General Laws (12-Y 9-N)
2021-02-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
2021-02-09HouseAssigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (20-Y 17-N 1-A)
2021-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1384S3
2021-02-04SenateSubstitute by Senator Surovell agreed to 21104413D-S3
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateSubstitute by Senator Surovell withdrawn 21104267D-S1
2021-02-04SenateSubstitute by Senator Surovell reconsidered 21104267D-S1 (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateRead second time
2021-02-04SenateFloor substitute printed 21104413D-S3 (Surovell)
2021-02-03SenatePassed by for the day
2021-02-03SenateAmendments by Senator Surovell withdrawn
2021-02-03SenateSubstitute by Senator Surovell withdrawn 21104309D-S2
2021-02-03SenateFloor substitute printed 21104309D-S2 (Surovell)
2021-02-02SenatePassed by for the day
2021-02-02SenateAmendments by Senator Surovell reconsidered (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateAmendments by Senator Surovell agreed to
2021-02-02SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-02SenateSubstitute by Senator Surovell agreed to 21104267D-S1
2021-02-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-02SenateAmendment #1 by Senator Surovell withdrawn
2021-02-02SenateRead second time
2021-02-01SenatePassed by for the day
2021-02-01SenateFloor substitute printed 21104267D-S1 (Surovell)
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N)
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102806D

Same As/Similar To

SB1384 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
224377.1(n/a)See Bill Text
224377.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1384
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1384+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1384S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1384S2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1384S3+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1384AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1384ASR
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1384F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1384FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1384FS2122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1384FS3122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S12C0027+SB1384
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0184SB1384+SB1384
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0256SB1384+SB1384
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0311SB1384+SB1384
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0329SB1384+SB1384
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1104V0006+SB1384
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H11V0016+SB1384
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0802V0012+SB1384

Bill Comments

feedback