VA HJR109 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-22 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ109ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-22 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ109ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Fairfax Spotlight on the Arts, Inc., on the occasion of its 25th anniversary.
Title
Commending Fairfax Spotlight on the Arts, Inc., on the occasion of its 25th anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ109ER) | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2010-01-18 | Senate: Received | |
2010-01-15 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2010-01-15 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2010-01-14 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 10103422D | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/13/10 10103422D |