VA HB457 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Full-day kindergarten programs; availability and building capacity. Requires each newly constructed elementary school building to have the capacity to accommodate a full-day kindergarten program. The bill also requires each local school board that does not offer a full-day kindergarten program for each kindergarten student in the school division to develop a plan to phase in a full-day kindergarten program for each kindergarten student in the school division over the course of three school years and submit the plan to the General Assembly in advance of the 2017 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Full-day kindergarten programs; availability and building capacity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Education |
2016-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation |
2016-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101012D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB457 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB457+hil |