VA HB440 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469)
Summary
Presumption of no bail for illegal aliens charged with certain crimes. Provides that a judicial officer shall presume, subject to rebuttal, that no condition or combination of conditions will reasonably assure the appearance of the person or the safety of the public if (i) the person is currently charged with an offense listed in subsection A of § 19.2-297.1 (acts of violence), subsection C of § 17.1-805 (acts of violence), any offense under Chapter 4 (§ 18.2-30 et seq.) of Title 18.2 (crimes against the person) except any offense under subsection A of § 18.2-57.2, any felony offense under Article 1 (§ 18.2-247 et seq.) of Chapter 7 of Title 18.2 (drug offenses), or any offense under Articles 2 (§ 18.2-266 et seq.), 4 (§ 18.2-279 et seq.), 5 (§ 18.2-288 et seq.), 6 (§ 18.2-299 et seq.), or 7 (§ 18.2-308 et seq.) of Chapter 7 of Title 18.2 (crimes involving health and safety), and (ii) the court determines that the person is illegally present in the United States. This presumption shall not exist unless the United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement has guaranteed that, in all such cases in the Commonwealth, it will issue a detainer for the initiation of removal proceedings and agrees to reimburse for the cost of incarceration from the time of the issuance of the detainer. This bill incorporates
Title
Illegal aliens; presumption of no bail for those charged with certain crimes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0469) | |
2008-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 469 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-29 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-29 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB440ER) | |
2008-02-29 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-27 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (84-Y 13-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 080296708-S1 (84-Y 13-N) | |
2008-02-26 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (33-Y 7-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB440S1 | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 080296708-S1 | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080296708-S1 | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 3-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-11 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-11 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Printed as engrossed 084235708-EH1 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB440EH1 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Amendment by Delegate Rust agreed to | |
2008-02-08 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 084235708-H1 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-06 | House: Committee substitute printed 084235708-H1 | |
2008-02-05 | House: Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087808708 |
Same As/Similar To
HB47 (Similar To) 2008-02-05 - House: Incorporated by Rules (HB440-Rust) by voice vote
HB757 (Similar To) 2010-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0132)
HB762 (Similar To) 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Rules
HB779 (Similar To) 2010-02-11 - House: Passed by in Transportation with letter (13-Y 8-N)
HB929 (Similar To) 2010-02-16 - House: Left in General Laws
HB1435 (Similar To) 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0762)
SB623 (Same As) 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0722)
HB757 (Similar To) 2010-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0132)
HB762 (Similar To) 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Rules
HB779 (Similar To) 2010-02-11 - House: Passed by in Transportation with letter (13-Y 8-N)
HB929 (Similar To) 2010-02-16 - House: Left in General Laws
HB1435 (Similar To) 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0762)
SB623 (Same As) 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0722)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB440 |