VA HB2195 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Workforce Development and Advancement created; consolidation of the Commonwealth's workforce development policies and programs; report. Creates the Department of Workforce Development and Advancement (the Department) to administer workforce development programs. The bill consolidates statewide workforce program evaluation and data sharing under the Department and provides protections against improper disclosure of data. The bill provides for the Virginia Board of Workforce Development to conduct an independent evaluation of the operations and program objectives of the Department on a biennial basis with the first report due on December 1, 2025. The bill also (i) transfers administration of apprenticeship programs from the Department of Labor and Industry to the Department, (ii) directs the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia to collaborate with the Department to grow and expand the Innovative Internship Fund and Program, and (iii) directs the Secretary of Labor (the Secretary) to conduct a comprehensive review of the Commonwealth's workforce development programs and make recommendations to address a wide range of subjects relating to improving the effectiveness and efficiency of such programs. The Secretary is also required to convene a stakeholder work group to advise the Secretary during the transition period. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Small Business Commission and is identical to
Title
Workforce development; consolidation of policies and programs, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0624) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 624 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2195ER) |
2023-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-22 | House | VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 23107114D-S2 (96-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2195S2 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Finance and Appropriations Committee substitute agreed to 23107114D-S2 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-21 | Senate | General Laws and Technology Committee substitute rejected 23106804D-S1 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23107114D-S2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23106804D-S1 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 45-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2195H2 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 23105937D-H2 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee on Commerce and Energy substitute rejected 23105424D-H1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105937D-H2 |
2023-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 8-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2023-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105424D-H1 |
2023-01-26 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2023-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101396D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1470 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0625)
SB1470 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0625)
SB1470 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0625)
Subjects
Administration of Government
Finance Secretary of
Labor Secretary of
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Unemployment Compensation
Workforce
Finance Secretary of
Labor Secretary of
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Unemployment Compensation
Workforce
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2035 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2058 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 214.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 214.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2237.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2238 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2471 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2472 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 435.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 435.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 223 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 224 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 277.06 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2906.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 117 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 127 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 1101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 113.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 400.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 631 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |