VA HB1901 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1901
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Online Virginia Driver's Manual course; training school. Removes the requirement that a driver training school providing the Virginia Driver's Manual course online be a computer-based driver education provider, as defined in the Code of Virginia.
Title
Online Virginia Driver's Manual course; training school.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-26 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics |
2021-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100811D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1901 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)