VA HB1901 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1901

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0139)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Online Virginia Driver's Manual course; training school. Removes the requirement that a driver training school providing the Virginia Driver's Manual course online be a computer-based driver education provider, as defined in the Code of Virginia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Online Virginia Driver's Manual course; training school.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0139)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 139 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-24 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-24HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1901ER)
2021-02-19HouseEnrolled
2021-02-16SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16SenateRead third time
2021-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-11SenateReported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-26HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-22HouseRead first time
2021-01-21HouseReported from Transportation (20-Y 1-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-12HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics
2021-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100811D

Same As/Similar To

HB1901 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462325(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB1901
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1901+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1901ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0139+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1901F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1901FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1903C0100+HB1901
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H19C0021+HB1901
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1121+HB1901
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S11C0033+HB1901
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S11V0010+HB1901
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0048HB1901+HB1901
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0054HB1901+HB1901

Bill Comments 750

feedback