VA HB1880 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Taxation of trusts established for disabled individuals. Establishes an individual income tax deduction not to exceed $2,000 for the fair market value of contributions made during the taxable year to certain supplemental needs trusts established for disabled individuals. The bill also would exempt from taxation the income earned by such trusts. The bill would become effective for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2011.
Title
Disabled individuals; taxation of trusts established therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-02-02 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-02-02 | House: Referred from Finance by voice vote | |
2011-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to HWI by voice vote | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103308D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1880 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1880+hil |