VA HB1414 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign finance; contributions from entities; disclosure of controlling individuals. Adds a requirement for campaign committees, political committees, and out-of-state political committees to report the name and address of any controlling individual with an ownership interest exceeding 50 percent in any contributor that is a corporation, partnership, business, or other like entity. The bill prohibits making or receiving contributions without required disclosure and imposes a civil penalty equal to the greater of $500 or the amount of the contribution.
Title
Campaign finance; contributions from entities, disclosure of controlling individuals.
Sponsors
Del. James Scott [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Privileges and Elections | |
2011-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-13 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #3 Campaign Finance | |
2010-09-27 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-09-27 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100168D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 945.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 947.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 949.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 949.9:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 950.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 951.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 952.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 953.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1414 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1414+hil |