VA HB1196 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Suspension of driver's license for nonpayment of fines or costs. Repeals the requirement that the driver's license of a person convicted of any violation of the law who fails or refuses to provide for immediate payment of fines or costs be suspended. The bill also removes a provision allowing the court to require a defendant to present a summary prepared by the Department of Motor Vehicles of the other courts in which the defendant also owes fines and costs. The bill requires the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles to return or reinstate any person's driver's license that was suspended prior to July 1, 2019, solely for nonpayment of fines or costs. Such person does not have to pay a reinstatement fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's license; suspension for nonpayment of fines or costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (68-Y 30-N) (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (1-Y 92-N) (Y: 1 N: 91 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 3-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1196ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 4-N)
2020-03-07SenateReconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 2-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (68-Y 30-N)
2020-03-05HouseConference report agreed to by House (68-Y 30-N)
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-02-27SenateSenators: Stanley, Ebbin, Morrissey
2020-02-27SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-02-27HouseDelegates: Lopez, Mullin, Kilgore
2020-02-27HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-02-27HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-02-26SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-02-26SenateSenate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 92-N)
2020-02-26HouseSenate amendments rejected by House (1-Y 92-N)
2020-02-26SenatePassed Senate with amendments (37-Y 3-N)
2020-02-26SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-02-26SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-26SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-26SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-26SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-26SenateRead third time
2020-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (12-Y 2-N)
2020-02-20SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-20SenateReported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 2-N)
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (72-Y 27-N)
2020-02-06HousePrinted as engrossed 20107235D-EH1
2020-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1196EH1
2020-02-06HouseEmergency clause deleted
2020-02-06HouseAmendment by Delegate Lopez agreed to
2020-02-06HousePassed by temporarily
2020-02-06HouseEngrossment reconsidered by House
2020-02-05HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1196H1
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107235D-H1
2020-02-05HouseRead second time
2020-02-04HouseRead first time
2020-01-31HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 3-N)
2020-01-31HouseIncorporates HB17 (Carroll Foy)
2020-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107235D-H1
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
2020-01-28HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-01-21HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-01-21HouseReferred from Transportation by voice vote
2020-01-15HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/08/20 20103348D

Same As/Similar To

HB17 (Similar To) 2020-01-31 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
HB17 (Similar To) 2020-01-31 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
SB1 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192258.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192354(n/a)See Bill Text
192354.1(n/a)See Bill Text
332503(n/a)See Bill Text
4621200.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462203.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462301(n/a)See Bill Text
462361(n/a)See Bill Text
462383(n/a)See Bill Text
462391.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462395(n/a)See Bill Text
462416(n/a)See Bill Text
462808.2(n/a)See Bill Text
462819.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462819.3(n/a)See Bill Text
462819.3:1(n/a)See Bill Text
462819.5(n/a)See Bill Text
462940(n/a)See Bill Text
462944.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462947(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1196&201+sum+HB1196
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1196+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1196H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1196EH1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1196ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0801V0080+HB1196
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0134+HB1196
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0601+HB1196
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S11V0074+HB1196
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0400+HB1196
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1050HB1196+HB1196
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1404+HB1196
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1078HB1196+HB1196
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1120HB1196+HB1196
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1970+HB1196
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1725HB1196+HB1196
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1726HB1196+HB1196
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1727HB1196+HB1196

Bill Comments

feedback