VA SB1 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0965)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Suspension of driver's license for nonpayment of fines or costs. Repeals the requirement that the driver's license of a person convicted of any violation of the law who fails or refuses to provide for immediate payment of fines or costs be suspended. The bill also removes a provision allowing the court to require a defendant to present a summary prepared by the Department of Motor Vehicles of the other courts in which the defendant also owes fines and costs. The bill requires the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles to return or reinstate any person's driver's license that was suspended prior to July 1, 2019, solely for nonpayment of fines or costs. Such person does not have to pay a reinstatement fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's license; suspension for nonpayment of fines or costs, reinstatement of privilege to drive.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (75-Y 25-N) (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0965)
2020-04-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 965 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-04SenateSigned by President
2020-03-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-03SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1ER)
2020-03-03SenateEnrolled
2020-02-26SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Passage (75-Y 25-N)
2020-02-26HousePassed House with amendment (75-Y 25-N)
2020-02-26HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2020-02-26HouseEmergency clause deleted
2020-02-26HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-26HouseRead third time
2020-02-25HouseRead second time
2020-02-21HouseReported from Appropriations (16-Y 6-N)
2020-02-19HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-19HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 3-N)
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-18HouseRead first time
2020-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-03SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31SenatePrinted as engrossed 20105850D-ES1
2020-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1ES1
2020-01-31SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-01-31SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-01-31SenateEmergency clause added
2020-01-31SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20105850D-S1
2020-01-31SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-31SenateRead second time
2020-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 2-N 1-A)
2020-01-15SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-15SenateIncorporates SB814 (Morrisey)
2020-01-15SenateIncorporates SB514 (Edwards)
2020-01-15SenateIncorporates SB10 (Ebbin)
2020-01-15SenateCommittee substitute printed 20105850D-S1
2020-01-15SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2019-11-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100383D

Same As/Similar To

SB10 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Incorporated by Judiciary
SB514 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Incorporated by Judiciary
SB814 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Incorporated by Judiciary
HB1196 (Same As) 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0964)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192258.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192354(n/a)See Bill Text
192354.1(n/a)See Bill Text
332503(n/a)See Bill Text
4621200.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462301(n/a)See Bill Text
462361(n/a)See Bill Text
462391.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462395(n/a)See Bill Text
462416(n/a)See Bill Text
462819.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462819.3(n/a)See Bill Text
462819.3:1(n/a)See Bill Text
462819.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB1
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB1S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB1ES1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB1ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0965+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0027+SB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0087+SB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0244SB0001+SB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0265SB0001+SB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0361+SB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0376+SB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1516+SB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1097SB0001+SB0001

Bill Comments

feedback