VA SB514 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Incorporated by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Incorporated by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Suspension of driver's license for nonpayment of fines or costs. Removes the requirement that a court suspend the driver's license of a person convicted of any violation of the law who fails or refuses to provide for immediate payment of fines or costs. The bill provides that the fine for any moving violation while operating a motor vehicle in a designated highway safety corridor shall be no more than $500 for any violation that is a traffic infraction and not less than $200 for any violation that is a criminal offense. The bill also repeals the Nonresident Violator Compact of 1977. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Driver's license; suspension for nonpayment of fines or costs, removes certain requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Judiciary (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | Incorporated by Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/08/20 20103345D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0965)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 258.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 354 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 354.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1200.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 203.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 361 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 383 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 391.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 395 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 808.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.3:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 940 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 944.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 947 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |